ME LD1354 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Study the Establishment of a System of Voting by Mail

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Study the Establishment of a System of Voting by Mail

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2021-05-14JointReported Out: ONTP
2021-05-05JointVoted: ONTP
2021-05-05JointWork Session Held
2021-04-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate on April 5, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback