ME LD1337 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Fund the Family Caregiver Support Program
Title
An Act To Fund the Family Caregiver Support Program
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] | Rep. Denise Harlow [D] |
Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] | Rep. Beth Turner [R] | Rep. Karen Vachon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-173) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-319) thereto |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-173) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-319) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-173) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-319) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-319) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-173) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-173) was ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-173) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending , in concurrence. |
2015-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-173), in concurrence. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-173) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-173) |
2015-05-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-05-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-04-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |