ME LD1331 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Individual and Small Group Health Insurance More Affordable in Certain High-premium Counties
Title
An Act To Make Individual and Small Group Health Insurance More Affordable in Certain High-premium Counties
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Louis Luchini [D] |
Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-487). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-487). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-487) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-31 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-10 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-08 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-05-04 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |