ME LD1324 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish the Committee To Study the Feasibility of Creating Basic Income Security
Title
Resolve, To Establish the Committee To Study the Feasibility of Creating Basic Income Security
Sponsors
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Michael Brennan [D] |
Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #154 (Y: 77 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #152 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #152 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently FINALLY PASSED |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-30 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-157). |
2019-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-157) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-30 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 154 (Yeas 77 - Nays 62 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-157) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-157) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-29 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 152 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-03-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-19 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |