ME LD1322 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding Mental Health First Aid Training for Corrections Personnel

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding Mental Health First Aid Training for Corrections Personnel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-19SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2017-06-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-15SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-499) in concurrence
2017-06-15SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-499) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-15SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-15SenateOn motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2017-06-15SenateReports Read
2017-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-14HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-499).
2017-06-14HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-14HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-499) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-14HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-14HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-14HouseReports READ.
2017-04-04SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
2017-04-04HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-04HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2017-04-04HouseCommittee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback