ME LD132 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement the Attorney General's Recommendations on Data Collection in Order To Eliminate Profiling in Maine
Title
An Act To Implement the Attorney General's Recommendations on Data Collection in Order To Eliminate Profiling in Maine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Recede And Concur RC #415 (Y: 74 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #419 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #347 (Y: 82 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #419 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #347 (Y: 82 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-07-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-07-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 415 (Yeas 74 - Nays 50 - Absent 27 - Excused 0) |
2021-07-02 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-705) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-375) thereto. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-705) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-375) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-705) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-375) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-375) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-705) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-705) was ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-705) in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-705) in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-705) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 419 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-705). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-705) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 347 (Yeas 82 - Nays 60 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-01-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-19 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 19, 2021. |