ME LD1318 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase High School Graduation Rates for Students Experiencing Education Disruption
Title
An Act To Increase High School Graduation Rates for Students Experiencing Education Disruption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - House - Enactment - Mandate RC #274 (Y: 80 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-07-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-07-02 | House | In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-07-01 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-01 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-246) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-363) thereto. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-246) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-363) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-246) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-363) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-363) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-246) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-246) was ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-246) in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 274 (Yeas 80 - Nays 50 - Absent 21 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-14 | House | In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2021-06-14 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Representative DUNPHY of Old Town REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Subsequently, Representative DUNPHY of Old Town WITHDREW her motion to TABLE. |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-246). |
2021-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-246). |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-246) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-05 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-05 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |