ME LD1315 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Firearm Use and Possession Rights during a State of Emergency and Require a Two-thirds Vote by the Legislative Council To Declare or Extend a State of Emergency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Firearm Use and Possession Rights during a State of Emergency and Require a Two-thirds Vote by the Legislative Council To Declare or Extend a State of Emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #353 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #259 (Y: 71 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2021-06-15SenateRoll Call Ordered
2021-06-15SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2021-06-15SenateReports READ
2021-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-14HouseROLL CALL NO. 259 (Yeas 71 - Nays 68 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
2021-06-14HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-14HouseReports READ.
2021-06-14JointReported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
2021-05-07JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-07JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-30SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
2021-03-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-03-30HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2021-03-30HouseCommittee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback