ME LD1312 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove Barriers to Accessory Dwelling Units and Allow Accessory Dwelling Units where Single-family Houses Are Allowed
Title
An Act To Remove Barriers to Accessory Dwelling Units and Allow Accessory Dwelling Units where Single-family Houses Are Allowed
Sponsors
Rep. Valli Geiger [D] | Rep. Kyle Bailey [D] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Sen. David Miramant [D] |
Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Rep. Laurie Osher [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #434 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-697) thereto in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-697) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-697) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) READ |
2021-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 434 Yeas 12 - Nays 22 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Motion to Table FAILED |
2021-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-697) thereto. |
2021-06-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-697) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, House Amendment "A" (H-697) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) was READ. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-16 | House | Subsequently, the Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2021-06-14 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town REMOVED. |
2021-06-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hickman of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor and Housing, in concurrence. |
2021-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |