ME LD1312 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding Access to Firearms by Extremely Dangerous and Suicidal Individuals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding Access to Firearms by Extremely Dangerous and Suicidal Individuals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amended RC #296 (Y: 61 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #318 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2019-06-18HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-18HouseOn motion of Representative BAILEY of Saco, REPORT B Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-18HouseROLL CALL NO. 296 (Yeas 61 - Nays 82 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
2019-06-18HouseMotion of Representative BAILEY of Saco to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
2019-06-18HouseReports READ.
2019-06-18SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-18SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 318 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-18SenateOn motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook Report B Ought Not To Pass ACCEPTED
2019-06-18SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-17SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-14SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT
2019-03-19HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-19HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2019-03-19SenateCommittee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback