ME LD1312 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Succession and Knowledge Transfer Plan for State Government
Title
An Act To Create a Succession and Knowledge Transfer Plan for State Government
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Charles Kruger [D] | Sen. Patrick Flood [R] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Sen. Douglas Thomas [R] | Sen. Rodney Whittemore [R] | Rep. Tom Winsor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order . |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-04-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Lachowicz of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1312&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0455&item=1&snum=126 |