ME LD1311 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Law Regarding Notice of Claim Recordings by Statutory Road Associations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Law Regarding Notice of Claim Recordings by Statutory Road Associations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-02 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #429 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #427 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #419 (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #301 (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02Senatein concurrence
2017-08-02SenateLD 1311 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 25 IN FAVOR and 9 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2017-08-02SenateOn motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate Sustained Veto
2017-08-02SenateHeld at the Request of CUSHING of Penobscot
2017-08-02SenateSubsequently LD 1311 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 22 IN FAVOR and 12 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
2017-08-02SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-07-20SenateUnfinished Business
2017-07-04SenateUnfinished Business
2017-07-01SenateUnfinished Business
2017-07-01SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION
2017-06-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 419V 142 having voted in the affirmative and 4 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2017-06-30HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-15SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-435) in concurrence
2017-06-15SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-435) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-15SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-15SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2017-06-15SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 301 Yeas 10 - Nays 25 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2017-06-15SenateSubsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
2017-06-15SenateTaken from the table by the President ProTem
2017-06-15SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-06-15SenateRoll Call Ordered
2017-06-15SenateTaken from the table by the President ProTem
2017-06-14SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-13SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-12SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-09SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-08SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-08SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-06-08SenateSenator KEIM of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2017-06-08SenateReports READ
2017-06-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-435).
2017-06-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-07HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-435) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-07HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-07HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-07HouseReports READ.
2017-04-06SenateOn motion by Senator Keim of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence.
2017-04-04HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-04HouseOn motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2017-04-04HouseCommittee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback