ME LD131 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Clarify and Correct Inland Fisheries and Wildlife Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Clarify and Correct Inland Fisheries and Wildlife Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-13SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-06-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-13HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-06-12HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-216).
2023-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2023-06-12HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2023-06-08SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2023-06-08SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-216).
2023-06-08SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-216) READ and ADOPTED.
2023-06-08SenateREAD ONCE.
2023-06-08SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2023-06-07JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2023-05-17JointVoted: OTP-AM
2023-05-15JointWork Session Reconsidered
2023-04-26JointVoted: OTP-AM
2023-04-26JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-01-10HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-01-10HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
2023-01-10SenateCommittee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback