ME LD1308 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Expedite the Processing of Applications for Certification under the Work Opportunity Tax Credit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Expedite the Processing of Applications for Certification under the Work Opportunity Tax Credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #91 (Y: 90 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-05-23SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE
2017-05-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-18HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2017-05-16SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-118) in concurrence
2017-05-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-118) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
2017-05-16SenateREAD ONCE
2017-05-16SenateOn motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report READ and ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2017-05-16SenateReports Read
2017-05-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-118).
2017-05-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-05-11HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-118) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-11HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-05-11HouseROLL CALL NO. 91 (Yeas 90 - Nays 53 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
2017-05-11HouseOn motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-05-11HouseReports READ.
2017-04-04SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence
2017-04-04HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-04HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
2017-04-04HouseCommittee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback