ME LD1307 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Fair Employment Opportunity for Maine Citizens and Legal Residents
Title
An Act To Ensure Fair Employment Opportunity for Maine Citizens and Legal Residents
Sponsors
Rep. Phyllis Ginzler [R] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] |
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. William Tuell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #219 (Y: 77 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-400) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-400) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-400) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 219 (Yeas 77 - Nays 69 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |