ME LD1305 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Increase Collaboration between the Maine State Housing Authority and the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Resolve, To Increase Collaboration between the Maine State Housing Authority and the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-349), in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-349) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-349). |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2021-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |