ME LD1299 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Amend the Maine Bail Code

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Amend the Maine Bail Code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-14 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #340 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #222 (Y: 81 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2023-06-14SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 340 Yeas 25 - Nays 10 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
2023-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
2023-06-14SenateReports READ
2023-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-14HouseROLL CALL NO. 222 (Yeas 81 - Nays 67 - Absent 2 - Excused 1)
2023-06-14HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-06-14HouseReports READ.
2023-06-13JointReported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
2023-04-20JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-04-20JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-28SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2023-03-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-23HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2023-03-23HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback