ME LD1290 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to End the Maine Information and Analysis Center Program
Title
An Act to End the Maine Information and Analysis Center Program
Sponsors
Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Rep. John Andrews [R] | Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Rep. Suzanne Salisbury [D] |
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-06-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2023-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |