ME LD1289 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Voluntary Payments in Lieu of Taxes in the Unorganized Territory
Title
An Act To Allow Voluntary Payments in Lieu of Taxes in the Unorganized Territory
Sponsors
Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] |
Rep. Roland Martin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | In concurrence. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-122). |
2017-05-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-24 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-122). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-122) READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |