ME LD1286 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 696 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 696 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate Compliance by School Employees with Criminal History Record Check and Fingerprinting Requirements
Title
An Act To Facilitate Compliance by School Employees with Criminal History Record Check and Fingerprinting Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Donald Marean [R] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Sen. William Diamond [D] |
Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Enactment RC #696 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 696 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-221) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-510) thereto. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-221) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-510) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-221) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-510) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-510) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-221) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-221) was ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-221) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-221). |
2017-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-06-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-221). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-221) READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |