ME LD1278 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To End the Maine Information and Analysis Center Program
Title
An Act To End the Maine Information and Analysis Center Program
Sponsors
Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] | Rep. John Andrews [R] | Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] |
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #337 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #252 (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #252 (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Majority Ought Not To Pass ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-229). |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 337 Yeas 29 - Nays 6 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-229). |
2021-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-229) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 252 (Yeas 88 - Nays 54 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-26 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-25 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 25, 2021. |