ME LD1276 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure All Legal Voters Are Able To Participate in Elections
Title
An Act To Ensure All Legal Voters Are Able To Participate in Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Tiffany Roberts-Lovell [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Sen. Louis Luchini [D] | Rep. Michele Meyer [D] |
Rep. Morgan Rielly [D] | Rep. Holly Stover [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-04-30 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-04-30 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-25 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 25, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1276&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0936&item=1&snum=130 |