ME LD1275 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Prevent Economic Hardship as a Result of COVID-19 Restrictions
Title
Resolve, To Prevent Economic Hardship as a Result of COVID-19 Restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #90 (Y: 82 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 90 (Yeas 82 - Nays 61 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-19 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-25 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 25, 2021. |