ME LD1275 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend and Remove the Need for Periodic Update of the Laws Governing the Validation of Title Defects
Title
An Act To Amend and Remove the Need for Periodic Update of the Laws Governing the Validation of Title Defects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |