ME LD1273 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Funding for Certain Essential Functions of the University of Maine Cooperative Extension Pesticide Safety Education Program
Title
An Act To Ensure Funding for Certain Essential Functions of the University of Maine Cooperative Extension Pesticide Safety Education Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-149). |
2019-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-149) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-149) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Subsequently Report Accepted |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Report READ |
2019-03-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |