ME LD1271 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Require a Disclaimer on Promotional Materials for Medicare, Medicaid and MaineCare Products by Private Entities
Title
An Act to Require a Disclaimer on Promotional Materials for Medicare, Medicaid and MaineCare Products by Private Entities
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Sen. Henry Ingwersen [D] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] |
Rep. Michele Meyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-139). |
2023-06-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-01 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-139). |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-139) READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-03 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |