ME LD1270 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Resentencing Units in the Attorney General's Office and All Maine Prosecutorial Districts
Title
An Act To Establish Resentencing Units in the Attorney General's Office and All Maine Prosecutorial Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #445 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #444 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #443 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - House - Insist RC #384 (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #362 (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #444 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #443 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - House - Insist RC #384 (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #362 (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 384 (Yeas 74 - Nays 55 - Absent 22 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-724) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 445 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 444 Yeas 11 - Nays 23 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Senator STEWART of Aroostook moved to Table Till Later FAILED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report was moved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 443 Yeas 17 - Nays 17 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-724). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-724) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 362 (Yeas 78 - Nays 58 - Absent 15 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-25 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 25, 2021. |