ME LD1269 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Preserve Fair Housing in Maine
Title
An Act To Preserve Fair Housing in Maine
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] |
Rep. Anne Perry [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] | Rep. Sophia Warren [I] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #300 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #201 (Y: 88 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #201 (Y: 88 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 300 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-476). |
2021-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 201 (Yeas 88 - Nays 55 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-25 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 25, 2021. |