ME LD1268 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Greater Access to Treatment for Serious Mental Illness by Restricting Prescription Drug Utilization Management by an Insurance Carrier
Title
An Act To Provide Greater Access to Treatment for Serious Mental Illness by Restricting Prescription Drug Utilization Management by an Insurance Carrier
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #314 (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-313). |
2021-06-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-313) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 314 (Yeas 90 - Nays 49 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-313) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-313) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-04 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 25, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |