ME LD1264 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Allowing the Harvesting of Yellow Perch with Seines
Title
An Act Allowing the Harvesting of Yellow Perch with Seines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-172), in concurrence. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-172) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-172) |
2013-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Dutremble of York, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE, in concurrence. |
2013-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |