ME LD1264 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 183 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 183 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Summary
An Act To Stabilize Funding and Enable DirigoChoice To Reach More Uninsured
Title
An Act To Stabilize Funding and Enable DirigoChoice To Reach More Uninsured
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 183 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2009-06-08 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-06-08 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT in concurrence Roll Call Requested | |
2009-06-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-05 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 205 (Yeas 83 - Nays 53 - Absent 15 - Excused 0) | |
2009-06-05 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-06-04 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) in concurrence | |
2009-06-04 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-04 | (S) On motion by Senator BOWMAN of York Senate Amendment "B" (S-293) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) INDEFINITELY POSTPONED (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 170 19 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2009-06-04 | (S) On motion by Senator MILLS of Somerset Senate Amendment "B" (S-293) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) READ (Remarks Made) | |
2009-06-04 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) READ | |
2009-06-04 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-06-04 | (S) 19 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2009-06-04 | (S) On motion by Senator BOWMAN of York Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence Roll Call # 169 | |
2009-06-04 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-06-04 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator BOWMAN of York to ACCEPT Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) Report in concurrence (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered | |
2009-06-04 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-06-03 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-06-03 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) Report in concurrence | |
2009-06-03 | (S) Senator BOWMAN of York moved to Accept Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) Report in concurrence | |
2009-06-03 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-490). | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 171 (Yeas 84 - Nays 58 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Representative TREAT of Hallowell moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Reports READ. |