ME LD1263 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - LD 1263 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 In Favor and 3 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - LD 1263 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 In Favor and 3 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Create Sustainable Growth in Maine's Distributed Energy Sector That Uses Market Forces To Fairly Compensate Energy Producers
Title
Resolve, To Create Sustainable Growth in Maine's Distributed Energy Sector That Uses Market Forces To Fairly Compensate Energy Producers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #397 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #411 (Y: 119 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - Final Passage RC #238 (Y: 101 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #411 (Y: 119 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - Final Passage RC #238 (Y: 101 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | LD 1263 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 In Favor and 3 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 411V 119 having voted in the affirmative and 28 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-15 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 238 (Yeas 101 - Nays 32 - Absent 18 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-368), in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-368) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-368) |
2015-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Woodsome of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence. |
2015-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |