ME LD1261 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Certain Health Care Professionals To Perform Abortions
Title
An Act To Authorize Certain Health Care Professionals To Perform Abortions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp Rpt RC #119 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #114 (Y: 74 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #114 (Y: 74 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 119 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 114 (Yeas 74 - Nays 58 - Absent 16 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |