ME LD1258 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Increase Access to Transportation for Workforce and Other Essential Transportation Needs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Increase Access to Transportation for Workforce and Other Essential Transportation Needs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-05SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-06-05SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-453), in concurrence.
2019-06-05SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-453) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-05SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-05SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-453).
2019-06-05HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-05HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-03-19SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
2019-03-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
2019-03-14HouseCommittee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback