ME LD1255 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Improve the Security of Voting Places
Title
An Act to Improve the Security of Voting Places
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-04-21 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2023-04-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |