ME LD1254 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Shielding Fire Departments That Install Smoke and Carbon Monoxide Detectors from Liability
Title
An Act Shielding Fire Departments That Install Smoke and Carbon Monoxide Detectors from Liability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-407), in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-407) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-407). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-24 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 24, 2021. |