ME LD1254 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Authorize a Local Option Sales Tax on Meals and Lodging and Provide Funding To Treat Opioid Use Disorder

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Authorize a Local Option Sales Tax on Meals and Lodging and Provide Funding To Treat Opioid Use Disorder

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - House - Adopt Hah-593 To Cah-536 RC #263 (Y: 80 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - Recede RC #262 (Y: 87 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #299 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #226 (Y: 73 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseLater today assigned.
2020-03-17HouseOn motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2020-03-17HouseReports READ.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-18HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-18HouseSubsequently, The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on TAXATION.
2019-06-18HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-06-18HouseLater today assigned.
2019-06-18HouseOn motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
2019-06-18SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-18SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Taxation In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-18SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-17SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2019-06-13HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-13HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2019-06-13HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-536) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-593) thereto.
2019-06-13HouseROLL CALL NO. 263 (Yeas 80 - Nays 60 - Absent 10 - Excused 1)
2019-06-13HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-536) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-593) thereto was ADOPTED.
2019-06-13HouseOn further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-593) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-536) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-13HouseROLL CALL NO. 262 (Yeas 87 - Nays 53 - Absent 10 - Excused 1)
2019-06-13HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the House RECEDED.
2019-06-13SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-13SenateSubsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-13SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 299 Yeas 14 - Nays 21 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-13SenateSenator CHIPMAN of Cumberland moved to Accept The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED
2019-06-13SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-12SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2019-06-12SenateReports READ
2019-06-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-536).
2019-06-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-11HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-536) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-11HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-11HouseROLL CALL NO. 226 (Yeas 73 - Nays 70 - Absent 6 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-06-11HouseOn motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-11HouseReports READ.
2019-03-19SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
2019-03-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2019-03-14HouseCommittee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback