ME LD1254 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Repeal Inactive Boards and Commissions
Title
An Act To Repeal Inactive Boards and Commissions
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-03 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-29 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-328) And House Amendment "A" (H-331) in concurrence | |
2009-05-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-05-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-28 | (S) House Amendment "A" (H-331) ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-28 | (S) On motion by Senator SIMPSON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of House Amendment "A" (H-331) in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) House Amendment "A" (H-331) READ | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-328) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-328) and House Amendment "A" (H-331). | |
2009-05-27 | (H) On motion of Representative PERCY of Phippsburg, House Amendment "A" (H-331) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) On motion of Representative PIOTTI of Unity, Tabled PENDING PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-328). | |
2009-05-21 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-328) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) On OBJECTION of Representative PERCY of Phippsburg REMOVED. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator Simpson of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218 in concurrence | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Representative BEAUDETTE for the Secretary of State pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 12006, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |