ME LD1250 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Sexual Harassment as a Subject Matter of Mandatory Arbitration in Employment Contracts
Title
An Act To Prohibit Sexual Harassment as a Subject Matter of Mandatory Arbitration in Employment Contracts
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] |
Sen. Mark Lawrence [D] | Rep. Gina Melaragno [D] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2019-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1250&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0911&item=1&snum=129 |