ME LD125 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit the Aerial Spraying of Glyphosate and Other Synthetic Herbicides for the Purpose of Silviculture
Title
An Act To Prohibit the Aerial Spraying of Glyphosate and Other Synthetic Herbicides for the Purpose of Silviculture
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] |
Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #463 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #210 (Y: 77 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #225 (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #210 (Y: 77 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #225 (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | LD 125 In Senate, June 30, 2021, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 18 and 16, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-185). |
2021-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "B" (S-185) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 210 (Yeas 77 - Nays 53 - Absent 21 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2021-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-185) |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (S-185) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-185) Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 225 Yeas 14 - Nays 19 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-184) Report FAILED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-27 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-16 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 19, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |