ME LD125 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Directing the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry To Convey Certain Lands to Roosevelt Conference Center Doing Business as Eagle Lake Sporting Camps

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Directing the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry To Convey Certain Lands to Roosevelt Conference Center Doing Business as Eagle Lake Sporting Camps

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - House - Final Passage - Public Land RC #286 (Y: 101 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - Recede And Concur - Public Land RC #284 (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Recede And Concur - Public Land RC #240 (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Passage RC #269 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Final Passage - Public Land RC #183 (Y: 96 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateSubsequently FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
2019-06-18SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-18SenateOn motion by Senator CARSON of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2019-06-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-18HouseROLL CALL NO. 286 (Yeas 101 - Nays 44 - Absent 5 - Excused 1)
2019-06-18HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2019-06-18HouseIn accordance with Section 23 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-06-17HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-17HouseROLL CALL NO. 284 (Yeas 101 - Nays 41 - Absent 8 - Excused 1)
2019-06-17HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-303) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-288) thereto.
2019-06-17SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-17SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-303) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-288) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-17SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-303) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-288) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-17SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-288) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-303) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-17SenateOn further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From ADOPTION Committee Amendment "A" (H-303)
2019-06-17SenateOn further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-303)
2019-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Senate RECEDED From FINAL PASSAGE
2019-06-17SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-14SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-13SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-13SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2019-06-12HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HouseSubsequently, The House INSISTED on it's previous action whereby the Resolve FAILED FINAL PASSAGE.
2019-06-12HouseROLL CALL NO. 240 (Yeas 98 - Nays 43 - Absent 9 - Excused 1)
2019-06-12HouseMotion to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED.
2019-06-12SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-12SenateSubsequently FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-11SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-10SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-06SenateOn motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Elected Required
2019-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HouseROLL CALL NO. 183 (Yeas 96 - Nays 47 - Absent 5 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-05HouseFAILED FINAL PASSAGE.
2019-06-05HouseSubsequently, in accordance with Section 23 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-06-05HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-06-04HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-04HouseLater today assigned.
2019-06-04HouseOn motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
2019-06-04HouseIn accordance with Section 23 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-06-03SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-303) in concurrence
2019-06-03SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-303) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-03SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-03SenateOn motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-03SenateReports Read
2019-05-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-30HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-303).
2019-05-30HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-30HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-303) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-30HouseThe Resolve was READ ONCE.
2019-05-30HouseSubsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-30HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-05-29HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-28HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-23HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-21HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-21HouseLater today assigned.
2019-05-21HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-05-21HouseRepresentative HICKMAN of Winthrop moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-05-21HouseReports READ.
2019-01-17SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
2019-01-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-17HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2019-01-17HouseCommittee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=125&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0107&item=1&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0107&item=2&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0107&item=5&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0107&item=6&snum=129
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070884&chamber=House&serialnumber=183
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070884&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=269
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070884&chamber=House&serialnumber=240
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070884&chamber=House&serialnumber=284
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280070884&chamber=House&serialnumber=286

Bill Comments

feedback