ME LD1247 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, to Study Training in Racial Issues, Racial Justice and Social Issues at the Maine Criminal Justice Academy and Study Additional Requirements for Law Enforcement Officers and Candidates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, to Study Training in Racial Issues, Racial Justice and Social Issues at the Maine Criminal Justice Academy and Study Additional Requirements for Law Enforcement Officers and Candidates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-12 - Senate - Accept Report 'a' Ought To Pass As Amended RC #279 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - Report A Otp As Amended RC #157 (Y: 71 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-26SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2023-06-13SenateOn motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
2023-06-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-13HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2023-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-231) in concurrence
2023-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-231) READ and ADOPTED
2023-06-12SenateREAD ONCE
2023-06-12SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 279 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
2023-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-231) ACCEPTED in concurrence
2023-06-12SenateReports READ
2023-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-08HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-231).
2023-06-08HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2023-06-08HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-231) was READ and ADOPTED.
2023-06-08HouseThe Resolve was READ ONCE.
2023-06-08HouseROLL CALL NO. 157 (Yeas 71 - Nays 59 - Absent 20 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
2023-06-08HouseSubsequently, on motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2023-06-08HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2023-06-07HouseUnfinished Business
2023-06-06HouseUnfinished Business
2023-06-01HouseUnfinished Business
2023-05-30HouseUnfinished Business
2023-05-30HouseLater today assigned.
2023-05-30HouseOn motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2023-05-30HouseReports READ.
2023-05-24JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2023-04-26JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-04-26JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-21SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
2023-03-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-21HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2023-03-21HouseCommittee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback