ME LD1241 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish More Transparency, Due Process, Education and Understanding between the Department of Health and Human Services and Certain Maine Businesses
Title
An Act To Establish More Transparency, Due Process, Education and Understanding between the Department of Health and Human Services and Certain Maine Businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #198 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 198 (Yeas 81 - Nays 63 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-23 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 23, 2021. |