ME LD1240 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Review Barriers to Regional Solutions for Housing Choices
Title
Resolve, To Review Barriers to Regional Solutions for Housing Choices
Sponsors
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Rep. Kyle Bailey [D] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] |
Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] | Rep. Denise Tepler [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #699 (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-647) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-647) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-647) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-647) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE |
2022-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-492). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-492) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 699 Yeas 20 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-31 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-09 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 23, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |