ME LD1234 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Lemonade Stands and Other Food and Nonalcoholic Beverage Sales by Minors
Title
An Act To Allow Lemonade Stands and Other Food and Nonalcoholic Beverage Sales by Minors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-05 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 22, 2021. |