ME LD1231 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Assess the Need for Mental Health Care Services for Veterans in Maine and To Establish a Pilot Program To Provide Case Management Services to Veterans for Mental Health Care
Title
Resolve, To Assess the Need for Mental Health Care Services for Veterans in Maine and To Establish a Pilot Program To Provide Case Management Services to Veterans for Mental Health Care
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Golden [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] |
Rep. Sara Gideon [D] | Sen. Louis Luchini [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Subsequently FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-27 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-06-27 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-407) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-553) thereto in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-27 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-27 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-407) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-553) thereto. |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-407) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-553) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2017-06-27 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-553) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-407) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-27 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-407). |
2017-06-27 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-21 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-407). |
2017-06-21 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-407). |
2017-06-21 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-407) in concurrence |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-407) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-06 | House | RELEASED. |
2017-06-06 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston. |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-407). |
2017-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-06 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-407) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-06 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |