ME LD1229 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Certain Medical Providers To Administer Ultrasounds and Provide Information to Certain Pregnant Patients
Title
An Act To Require Certain Medical Providers To Administer Ultrasounds and Provide Information to Certain Pregnant Patients
Sponsors
Rep. Abigail Griffin [R] | Rep. Meldon Carmichael [R] | Rep. John Ducharme [R] | Rep. Maryanne Kinney [R] |
Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #426 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #345 (Y: 81 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #345 (Y: 81 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 426 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 345 (Yeas 81 - Nays 62 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-16 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2021-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 22, 2021. |