ME LD1219 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Establish Rights for Holders of Certain Leases and Easements on Land Managed by the Bureau of Parks and Lands

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Establish Rights for Holders of Certain Leases and Easements on Land Managed by the Bureau of Parks and Lands

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-30 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #101 (Y: 77 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #186 (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-30HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2023-05-30HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 101 (Yeas 77 - Nays 62 - Absent 11 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
2023-05-30HouseOn motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-05-30HouseReports READ.
2023-05-25SenateSent down for concurrence
2023-05-25SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 186 Yeas 19 - Nays 12 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
2023-05-25SenateOn motion by Senator INGWERSEN of York The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
2023-05-25SenateReports READ
2023-05-22JointReported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
2023-04-12JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-04-12JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-21HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-21HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2023-03-21SenateCommittee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback