ME LD1217 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Oversight of the Family Development Account Program
Title
An Act To Clarify the Oversight of the Family Development Account Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-167). |
2019-06-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-167). |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-167) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |