ME LD1212 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Definition of "Eligible Business Equipment" for the Purposes of the Business Equipment Tax Exemption Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Definition of "Eligible Business Equipment" for the Purposes of the Business Equipment Tax Exemption Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-09SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
2017-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-06HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-06HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-180).
2017-06-06HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-06-06HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-06-05SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2017-06-05SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-180).
2017-06-05SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-180) READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-05SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-06-05SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-03-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2017-03-28SenateCommittee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback